THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:34:55 AM
Cook, Sonya Maureen
CPSO#:
77920
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Compass Dermatology
Unit 8
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON M4S 2N5
Phone: (647) 351-9277
Fax: (647) 351-9077
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:10 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SONYA MAUREEN COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |