THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:17:51 PM
Cipolletti, Adriana Alexandra
CPSO#:
77918
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
36 Grey Street
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site |
Lions Head |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site |
Meaford |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIANA ALEXANDRA CIPOLLETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPOLLETTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2004 |