THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:46:11 AM
Burry, Andrea Florence
CPSO#:
77909
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
171 Slater St
Ottawa ON K1P 5H7
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA FLORENCE BURRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 02 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2015 |