THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:44:29 AM
Boulton, Melfort Richard
CPSO#:
77906
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Room C7 124
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3602
Fax: (519) 663-3601
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Melfort Boulton Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELFORT RICHARD BOULTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |