THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:55:19 AM
Belchetz, Brett
CPSO#:
77893
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
New Brunswick
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRETT BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2004 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)