THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:56:35 PM
Norris, Sandhaya
CPSO#:
77879
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wadhawan, Sandhaya (used until: 04 Jul 2002 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Rd
Canadian Forces Health Services
Montfort Site
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-945-1060
Fax: 613-945-1070
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDHAYA NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 31 Oct 2006 to 22 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |