THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:18:23 PM
Barnett, Aaron Douglas Earl
CPSO#:
77866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
40 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON L3V 5S3
Phone: (705) 327-3330
Fax: (705) 327-7675
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jul 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON DOUGLAS EARL BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2002 to 02 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2005 |