THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:18:13 AM
Petrie, Matthew Douglas
CPSO#:
77861
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kelowna General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2268 Pandosy Streeet
Kelowna BC V1Y 1T2
Phone: 2509801760
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:07 Feb 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DOUGLAS PETRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2006 to 02 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Ottawa, 03 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2007 |