THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:26:19 PM
Wise, Yishai Avraham
CPSO#:
77844
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YISHAI AVRAHAM WISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2007 |