THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:51:43 PM
Iwaasa, Kenneth Kojun
CPSO#:
77836
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Japanese
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Iwaasa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 23 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2010 |