THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:57:32 AM
Burdett, Rachel L
CPSO#:
77819
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8440 112 St NW
University of Alberta Hospital
Child & Adol Psychiatry
1E1
Edmonton AB T6G 2B7
Phone: 7804072114
Fax: 7804077721
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Jul 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL L BURDETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURDETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Sep 2005 to 09 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Sep 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2007 |