THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:26:29 AM
Catania, Amy Margaret Kathleen
CPSO#:
77780
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Horvat, Amy Margaret Kathleen (used until: 07 Jul 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
712 Main Street East
Shelburne ON L9V 2Z4
Phone: 2262599000
Fax: 226-486-0126
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMY MARGARET KATHLEEN CATANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATANIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2005 |