THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:17:08 PM
Kim, Linda Eugenia
CPSO#:
77778
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4104
Fax: (905)813-4347
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:21 Oct 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LINDA EUGENIA KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 15 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2007 |