THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:05:15 PM
Nofech-Mozes, Yehuda
CPSO#:
77775
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7234
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nofech-Mozes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 May 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
|
Active |