THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:56:56 PM
Yap, Audrey Poh Geck
CPSO#:
77754
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Health
Outpatient Clinic
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Phone: 416-461-8252 Ext. 2933
Fax: 416-461-2089
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AUDREY POH GECK YAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2007 |