THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:50:24 PM
Malik, Abdul
CPSO#:
77751
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu
Education: University of Sind, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
James Potter Rd Medical Centre
9715 James Potter Road
Unit # 102-103
Brampton ON L6X 3B9
Phone: (905) 457-5800
Fax: (905) 457-5080
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Sep 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDUL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 03 Sep 2003
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2012 |