THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:53:46 AM
Armour, Christine Marion
CPSO#:
77746
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Genetics Clinic WC2
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 2826
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. Armour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:01 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARION ARMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMOUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2008 |