THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:03:12 AM
Katzberg, Hans Dieter
CPSO#:
77740
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street
5EC 306A
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3662
Fax: (416) 340-4081
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANS DIETER KATZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2010 |