THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:35:36 PM
Shim, Paul Sup
CPSO#:
77725
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 498-0368
Fax: (613) 498-3961
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL SUP SHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2007 |