THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:30:01 PM
Mankal, Fawzi Ahmad
CPSO#:
77719
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Fax: (613) 739-7043
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAWZI AHMAD MANKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANKAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |