THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:34:22 AM
Boll, Philip Richard
CPSO#:
77703
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
24 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
24-Mar-2024
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 24 Mar 2024 |