THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:54:02 PM
Kilty, Shaun Jason
CPSO#:
77665
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
259-737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 1J8
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18514
Fax: 613-729-2412
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAUN JASON KILTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |