THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:56:59 PM
Bhimani, Munsif Ali
CPSO#:
77658
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:20 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUNSIF ALI BHIMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIMANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2004 |