THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:54:09 PM
Bhattacharjee, Rakesh
CPSO#:
77647
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: McMaster University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:18 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |