THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:37:45 AM
Becker, Taryn
CPSO#:
77646
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
511 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-8353
Fax: (416) 438-6503
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARYN BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2006 |