THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:31:04 PM
Northey, Angela Joy
CPSO#:
77644
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Homewood Health Centre |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Dec 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELA JOY NORTHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2008 |