THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 17:09:58 PM
Khamisa, Karima
CPSO#:
77631
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2C 0C6
Phone: (613) 224-6606
Fax: (613) 224-6162
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARIMA KHAMISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMISA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 24 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2005 to 24 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2006 to 24 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2007 to 05 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2007 |