THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:52:58 PM
Dagnone, Jeffrey Damon
CPSO#:
77629
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAMON DAGNONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAGNONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2007 |