THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:57:38 PM
Ward, Colin James
CPSO#:
77616
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 737-0363
Fax: (705) 737-2842
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLIN JAMES WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |