THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:23:41 AM
Saidenberg, Elianna
CPSO#:
77610
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
20 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Oct-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: McMaster University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:17 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Transfusion Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Transfusion Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 20 Oct 2019 |