THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:07:19 AM
Plant, Sandi Lynne
CPSO#:
77608
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Healthca
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: 705-549-3181
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sandi Plant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDI LYNNE PLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2005 |