THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:21:31 PM
Cenic, Aleksa
CPSO#:
77581
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: McMaster University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Wing
237 Barton Street East
Room 730
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46781
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEKSA CENIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CENIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2011 |