THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:54:39 AM
Price, David Harold
CPSO#:
77566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Albion Finch Medical Centre
Unit 106
1620 Albion Road
Toronto ON M9V 4B4
Phone: (416) 741-1500
Fax: (416) 741-1506
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID HAROLD PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2004 |