THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:45:25 PM
Payne, Michael W
CPSO#:
77565
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Parkwood Institute
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-4000 Ext. 45027
Fax: (519) 685-4009
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL W PAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |