THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:01:45 AM
Llewellyn, Matthew Evan Michael
CPSO#:
77555
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Sep 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW EVAN MICHAEL LLEWELLYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLEWELLYN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: November 20, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Matthew Evan Llewellyn was charged with the following offences:
1. Assault, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault – Choking, between June 1, 2022 and June 30, 2022, contrary to section 267(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: November 20, 2023
Place of Charge: Niagara Falls, Ontario
Niagara Regional Police Service