THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:17:38 PM
John, Verity Jayne
CPSO#:
77550
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 128
101 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: 289-633-3801
Fax: (905) 286-0008
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:31 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VERITY JAYNE JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 16, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)