THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:16:18 AM
Gidwani, Andy Jose
CPSO#:
77544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Mar 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Health Care Centre
130 Adelaide St. West
Lower Concourse
P.O.Box 92
Toronto ON M5H 3P5
Phone: (416) 361-6142
Fax: (416) 361-1200
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Mar 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDY JOSE GIDWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDWANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Feb 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2020 |