THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:13:48 AM
Eickmeier, Daniel James
CPSO#:
77543
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-81 2nd St SE
Chesley Hospital
Chesley ON N0G 1L0
Phone: 519-363-2340
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site |
Meaford |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Seaforth Community Hospital |
Seaforth |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL JAMES EICKMEIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EICKMEIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2004 |