THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:12:46 AM
Vanderkooy, John David
CPSO#:
77526
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO 8056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2144
Fax: (519) 749-4301
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID VANDERKOOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERKOOY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |