THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:35:40 PM
Nayar-Kingwell, Sunita Maria
CPSO#:
77520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Nayar, Sunita Maria (used until: 18 Sep 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Active Care Carlingwood
Suite 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K2A 1H2
Phone: (613) 761-6777
Fax: (613) 761-7744
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:14 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNITA MARIA NAYAR-KINGWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYAR-KINGWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 14 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2004 to 14 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2005 to 14 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2010 |