THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:15:04 PM
Isac, Michelle Marie
CPSO#:
77492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE MARIE ISAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2008 |