THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:21:41 PM
Mortazavi, Amir Ali
CPSO#:
77455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-50 Minthorn Blvd
KMH cardiology centre
Thornhill ON L3T 7X8
Phone: (905) 855-1860
Fax: (905) 855-1863
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIR ALI MORTAZAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTAZAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2002 |