THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:31:40 PM
Sur, Monalisa
CPSO#:
77434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Punjab University India, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42051
Fax: (905) 389-1698
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
South Africa
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:29 Jul 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2002 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 May 2004 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Aug 2016 |
|
Active |