THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:34:58 PM
Vasudeva, Pratibha Rajvanshi
CPSO#:
77415
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Rajasthan University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CHARM Fertility Clinic
B 627 Lyons Lane
Oakville ON L6J 5Z7
Phone: (905) 844-7238
Fax: (905) 844-7256
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:12 Jun 2003 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
|
Active |