THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:08:29 AM
Jin, Fengling
CPSO#:
77414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Beijing Medical University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6290
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FENGLING JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |