THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:47:01 AM
John, Verghese
CPSO#:
77386
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: Ranchi University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: 5194214223
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VERGHESE JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Feb 2002 to 31 May 2002
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2002 |