THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:41:43 PM
Trzcieniecka, Anna Agata
CPSO#:
77325
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
414-Unit 3
Main Street
Port Dover ON N0A 1N0
Phone: 2265349771
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNA AGATA TRZCIENIECKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRZCIENIECKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2002 to 30 Mar 2002
EL - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2005 |