THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:51:32 PM
Dawes, Peter David
CPSO#:
77319
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
87 Morrison Lane
New London PE C0B 1M0
Phone: (902) 886-2769
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter Dawes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 1 2011
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER DAVID DAWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2012 |