THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:28:39 AM
Babaran, Shirley De La Cruz
CPSO#:
77311
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Umbalin, Shirley De La Cruz (used until: 13 Jul 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Ilocano, Tagalog
Education: Far Eastern University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-245-2463
Fax: 705-245-0135
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Shirley Babaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY DE LA CRUZ BABARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABARAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2015 |