THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:44:00 AM
Chunduri, Krishna Veni
CPSO#:
77307
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu
Education: Osmania University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9500 Markham Road
Markham ON L6E 0N6
Phone: (905) 201-1155
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Feb 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISHNA VENI CHUNDURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNDURI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Feb 2002 to 18 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Feb 2003 to 18 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2004 |